THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 10:40:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Extension: 5858
Fax: (519) 751-5570

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site Paris
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site
LOCATION: Paris

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO, ITALIAN
Medical School: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Extension: 5858
Fax: (519) 751-5570

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site Paris
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System Willett Site
LOCATION: Paris

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY DE PORRES ILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY DE PORRES ILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universita Cattolica del Sacro Cuore, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2007