THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:17:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wurzburg, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wurzburg, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wurzburg, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine
01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine
01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
14 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 14 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2007