THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:35:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
07 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
01 May 2007 to 28 Jun 2007
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 07 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 May 2007 to 28 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 May 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2007