THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:41:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Suite 110
265 Front Street
Sarnia, Ontario
N7T 7X1
Date Received: 12 Jun 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Suite 110
265 Front Street
Sarnia, Ontario
N7T 7X1
Date Received: 12 Jun 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2007