THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:57:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
5095 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 6Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 479-8685
Fax: (416) 479-8688
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 6474906330
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
200 Consilium Place, Suite 104
Toronto Ontario M1H 3E4
Phone: 416-479-8686
Fax: 416-479-8688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
5095 Yonge Street
North York Ontario M2N 6Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 479-8685
Fax: (416) 479-8688
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: 6477222370
Fax: 6474906330
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
200 Consilium Place, Suite 104
Toronto Ontario M1H 3E4
Phone: 416-479-8686
Fax: 416-479-8688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JING JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JING JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007