THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:49:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Benin, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Feb 2021
Summary of Decision:
On November 20, 2019, allegations of Dr. Okafor’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Okafor engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A, and in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to Patient A and Patient B.

The Discipline Committee held a hearing on October 26 to 28 and October 30, 2020 by way of videoconference in the presence of Dr. Okafor, his counsel and counsel for the College.

In its decision released on February 17, 2021, the Committee found that Dr. Okafor engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A, and that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, with respect to Patient A and Patient B. Further, the Committee found that Dr. Okafor’s lack of cooperation with the College’s investigation also constituted disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.

Given the Committee’s findings, the Committee made an interim order for immediate suspension of Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration, until such time as the Committee makes an order under subsection 51(5) or (5.2) of the Code.

On April 30, 2021, the Committee heard submissions from both parties on penalty and costs, and released its order. The Committee ordered and directed:

- Dr. Okafor to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- The Registrar to revoke Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration effective immediately.
- The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration effective immediately:
(i) Dr. Okafor shall comply with the College Policy, “Closing a Medical Practice.”
- Dr. Okafor to reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this order in the amount of $17,370.
- Dr. Okafor to pay costs to the College in the amount of $51,850 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

The Committee’s reasons for decision on penalty were released on May 20, 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.

Appeal

On March 29, 2021, the College received Dr. Okafor’s Notice of Appeal dated March 25, 2021, setting out Dr. Okafor’s intention to appeal the Discipline Committee’s February 17, 2021 decision on finding to the Divisional Court.
 
On December 14, 2023, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Okafor’s appeal for reasons provided in Okafor v. College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, 2023 ONSC 6332.
 
On December 29, 2023, Dr. Okafor filed a Notice of Motion with the Court of Appeal for Ontario for leave to appeal the Divisional Court’s decision dated December 14, 2023.
 
On August 22, 2024, the Court of Appeal for Ontario dismissed Dr. Okafor's motion for leave to appeal.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal to Ontario Divisional Court
Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2020-10-26 to 28, 30; Penalty: 2021-04-30

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Mar 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 19, 2019:

See attached PDF 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 17 Feb 2021
Summary of Decision:
On November 20, 2019, allegations of Dr. Okafor’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Okafor engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A, and in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to Patient A and Patient B.

The Discipline Committee held a hearing on October 26 to 28 and October 30, 2020 by way of videoconference in the presence of Dr. Okafor, his counsel and counsel for the College.

In its decision released on February 17, 2021, the Committee found that Dr. Okafor engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A, and that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, with respect to Patient A and Patient B. Further, the Committee found that Dr. Okafor’s lack of cooperation with the College’s investigation also constituted disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.

Given the Committee’s findings, the Committee made an interim order for immediate suspension of Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration, until such time as the Committee makes an order under subsection 51(5) or (5.2) of the Code.

On April 30, 2021, the Committee heard submissions from both parties on penalty and costs, and released its order. The Committee ordered and directed:

- Dr. Okafor to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- The Registrar to revoke Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration effective immediately.
- The Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration effective immediately:
(i) Dr. Okafor shall comply with the College Policy, “Closing a Medical Practice.”
- Dr. Okafor to reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this order in the amount of $17,370.
- Dr. Okafor to pay costs to the College in the amount of $51,850 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

The Committee’s reasons for decision on penalty were released on May 20, 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.

Appeal

On March 29, 2021, the College received Dr. Okafor’s Notice of Appeal dated March 25, 2021, setting out Dr. Okafor’s intention to appeal the Discipline Committee’s February 17, 2021 decision on finding to the Divisional Court.
 
On December 14, 2023, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Okafor’s appeal for reasons provided in Okafor v. College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, 2023 ONSC 6332.
 
On December 29, 2023, Dr. Okafor filed a Notice of Motion with the Court of Appeal for Ontario for leave to appeal the Divisional Court’s decision dated December 14, 2023.
 
On August 22, 2024, the Court of Appeal for Ontario dismissed Dr. Okafor's motion for leave to appeal.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal to Ontario Divisional Court
Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2020-10-26 to 28, 30; Penalty: 2021-04-30

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Mar 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 19, 2019:

See attached PDF 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 30 Apr 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2007