THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sorensen, Kyla Marie (Used Until: 11 Feb 2014)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Lakeshore Rd, Suite 103
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr, Kyla Ludlow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: Sorensen, Kyla Marie (Used Until: 11 Feb 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Lakeshore Rd, Suite 103
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Aug 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr, Kyla Ludlow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLA MARIE LUDLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDLOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLA MARIE LUDLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDLOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007