THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:53:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
205 Tawa Centre
3017 - 66 Street NW
Edmonton, AB T6K 4B2
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Instructions/Address:
c/o Dr. Mary MacDonald
Suite 200
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A5
Tel: 807-345-5056
Fax: 1-888-504-1696
Date Received: 12 Oct 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
205 Tawa Centre
3017 - 66 Street NW
Edmonton, AB T6K 4B2
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Instructions/Address:
c/o Dr. Mary MacDonald
Suite 200
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A5
Tel: 807-345-5056
Fax: 1-888-504-1696
Date Received: 12 Oct 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007