THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:45:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Barthos, Althea Alexina (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Barthos, Althea Alexina (Used Until: 14 Feb 2012)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Country Glen Medical Clinic
592 Country Glen Road Unit C
Markham Ontario L6B 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 554-4001
Fax: (905) 554-4002
Address: 377 Church Street
Suite 306
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-554-4001
Fax: 905-554-4002
Address: G7-377 Church Street
Medical Office Building
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: Barthos, Althea Alexina (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Barthos, Althea Alexina (Used Until: 14 Feb 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Country Glen Medical Clinic
592 Country Glen Road Unit C
Markham Ontario L6B 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 554-4001
Fax: (905) 554-4002
Address: 377 Church Street
Suite 306
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-554-4001
Fax: 905-554-4002
Address: G7-377 Church Street
Medical Office Building
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7614
Fax: 905-472-7618

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALTHEA ALEXINA BURRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALTHEA ALEXINA BURRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007