THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7M 2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138760154
Fax: 613-544-7800
Address: Providence Manor LTC
275 Sydenham Street
Kingston Ontario K7K1G7
Phone: 613-549-4164
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Kingsbridge Retirement Residenc
950 Centennial Drive
Kingston Ontario K7M0G8
Phone: 613-583-2555
Fax: 613-650-1445
Address: THe Royale Retirement Residence
2485 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M3G1
Phone: 613-328-2661
Fax: 613-634-5972
Address: 630 MacLean Court
Kingston Ontario K7K 7L8
Phone: 613-876-0154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7M 2G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138760154
Fax: 613-544-7800
Address: Providence Manor LTC
275 Sydenham Street
Kingston Ontario K7K1G7
Phone: 613-549-4164
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Kingsbridge Retirement Residenc
950 Centennial Drive
Kingston Ontario K7M0G8
Phone: 613-583-2555
Fax: 613-650-1445
Address: THe Royale Retirement Residence
2485 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7M3G1
Phone: 613-328-2661
Fax: 613-634-5972
Address: 630 MacLean Court
Kingston Ontario K7K 7L8
Phone: 613-876-0154
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA LARA PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA LARA PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007