THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:15:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 216E-2115 Finch Ave. W.
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-740-1832
Fax: 416-747-3799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 20 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Goode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 216E-2115 Finch Ave. W.
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-740-1832
Fax: 416-747-3799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 20 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Goode Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA COLLEEN GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA COLLEEN GOODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007