THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:13:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Extension: 6343
Fax: (416) 424-3828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 425-6220
Extension: 6343
Fax: (416) 424-3828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA SHOSHANA HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA SHOSHANA HOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007