THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:06:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897259997
Fax: 2897259797
Address: William Osler Health system
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Premium Cardiac Centre Oakville
429 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
Phone: 2897259997
Fax: 2897259797

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esam Elbarasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897259997
Fax: 2897259797
Address: William Osler Health system
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Premium Cardiac Centre Oakville
429 Dundas Street West
Oakville Ontario L6M 1L9
Phone: 2897259997
Fax: 2897259797

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esam Elbarasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESAM ABDELKARIM ELBARASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBARASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESAM ABDELKARIM ELBARASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBARASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007