THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:51:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBRECHT WOLFRAM SCHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBRECHT WOLFRAM SCHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2007