THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:22:12 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1996
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
23 Sep 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
23 Sep 2007 to 22 Sep 2008
Queen's University
PEAP - R - Respiratory Medicine
01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2009 to 22 Sep 2010
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2007 to 22 Sep 2008
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Respiratory Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007