THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056357313
Fax: 9056352464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056357313
Fax: 9056352464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN MICHELLE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN MICHELLE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007