THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:44:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21500
Fax: 4162421068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21500
Fax: 4162421068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNAM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNAM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007