THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:23:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 434 North Trade Street
Elysian MedSpa
Suite 104a
Matthews North Carolina 28105
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7048995038
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tejal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Tejal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jun 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 434 North Trade Street
Elysian MedSpa
Suite 104a
Matthews North Carolina 28105
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7048995038
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tejal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Tejal Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jun 2011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEJAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEJAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007