THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:39:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5501 N University Drive
Suite 104
Coral Springs, FL 33067
Coral Springs Florida 33067
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9547570670
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5501 N University Drive
Suite 104
Coral Springs, FL 33067
Coral Springs Florida 33067
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9547570670
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TABASSUM MUSARRAT HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TABASSUM MUSARRAT HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007