THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 20:36:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 07 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 07 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 07 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 07 Apr 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 07 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Apr 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 13 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Andrew Craig Don-Wauchope may practise medicine independently in Medical
Biochemistry and Endocrinology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Andrew Craig Don-Wauchope may practise medicine independently in Medical
Biochemistry and Endocrinology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2007