THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-99 Sinclair Ave
VIP Medical Clinic
Georgetown ON L7G 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 877 9998
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 221 Glendale Ave
(inside the walmart)
St. Catharines ON L2T 2K9
Phone: 905-687-4252
Fax: 905-687-9338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-99 Sinclair Ave
VIP Medical Clinic
Georgetown ON L7G 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 877 9998
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 221 Glendale Ave
(inside the walmart)
St. Catharines ON L2T 2K9
Phone: 905-687-4252
Fax: 905-687-9338

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
15 Dec 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 24, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rai to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:

Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 24, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rai to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:

Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 19 Jan 2016
Summary of Decision:
On January 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

During the relevant time period, Dr. Rai practised in an emergency room at the only hospital in a small town. He was also engaged in a sexual relationship with the woman in issue, Ms. A, throughout that period. It was undisputed that Dr. Rai assessed, diagnosed and treated Ms. A on one occasion in a clinic and on nine occasions at the hospital ER over a number of years. The Discipline Committee determined that the medical treatments did not give rise to a physician- patient relationship, however. It noted that there was no evidence that Dr. Rai provided regular care to Ms. A and that there was no evidence the ER visits were arranged ahead of time, or that there was another physician available in the ER to see her when she visited. All of the treatment occasions constituted “incidental care.” In particular, the Committee held that “given the context of the small town ER, Dr. Rai had no choice but to attend to [her] medical needs and to provide care for her problems,” finding that the ER visits were “incidental care to a spouse, given the nature of the visits and the unique set of circumstances in this case.” The clinic treatment was ill-advised, but it did not create a doctor-patient relationship.

Dr. Rai was found to have engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to treating Ms. A at a clinic visit at which he performed a Pap test and ordered blood work, by treating a family member in a non-emergency situation.

PENALTY

On May 6, 2016, the Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration for period of two (2) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 7, 2016.

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration:
 
Dr. Rai shall participate in and successfully complete the next available course on “Understanding Boundaries and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship” offered by Western University, or an equivalent program acceptable to the College, and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof of completion thereof to the College.

COSTS

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00, within one hundred and twenty (120) days of the date upon which the suspension of his certificate of registration is lifted.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 27-31, 2015

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 19 Jan 2016
Summary of Decision:
On January 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

During the relevant time period, Dr. Rai practised in an emergency room at the only hospital in a small town. He was also engaged in a sexual relationship with the woman in issue, Ms. A, throughout that period. It was undisputed that Dr. Rai assessed, diagnosed and treated Ms. A on one occasion in a clinic and on nine occasions at the hospital ER over a number of years. The Discipline Committee determined that the medical treatments did not give rise to a physician- patient relationship, however. It noted that there was no evidence that Dr. Rai provided regular care to Ms. A and that there was no evidence the ER visits were arranged ahead of time, or that there was another physician available in the ER to see her when she visited. All of the treatment occasions constituted “incidental care.” In particular, the Committee held that “given the context of the small town ER, Dr. Rai had no choice but to attend to [her] medical needs and to provide care for her problems,” finding that the ER visits were “incidental care to a spouse, given the nature of the visits and the unique set of circumstances in this case.” The clinic treatment was ill-advised, but it did not create a doctor-patient relationship.

Dr. Rai was found to have engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to treating Ms. A at a clinic visit at which he performed a Pap test and ordered blood work, by treating a family member in a non-emergency situation.

PENALTY

On May 6, 2016, the Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration for period of two (2) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 7, 2016.

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Rai’s certificate of registration:
 
Dr. Rai shall participate in and successfully complete the next available course on “Understanding Boundaries and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship” offered by Western University, or an equivalent program acceptable to the College, and shall forthwith thereafter provide proof of completion thereof to the College.

COSTS

The Committee ordered Dr. Rai to pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00, within one hundred and twenty (120) days of the date upon which the suspension of his certificate of registration is lifted.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 27-31, 2015

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 May 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 26 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 10 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 06 Jul 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 22 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 10 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 07 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2007