THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:55:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 2001
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
15 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
08 Sep 2007 to 14 Jul 2008
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
02 Aug 2007 to 07 Sep 2007
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 15 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 08 Sep 2007 to 14 Jul 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 02 Aug 2007 to 07 Sep 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2007