THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 287-0002
Fax: (416) 284-4510

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 287-0002
Fax: (416) 284-4510

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON CONRAD SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON CONRAD SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2007