THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:31:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Fax: 905 844 5537

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Fax: 905 844 5537

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAWA KAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAWA KAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2007