THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew B. Yadegari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew B. Yadegari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BARBOD YADEGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADEGARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BARBOD YADEGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADEGARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2007