THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 20:57:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Monash University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Monash University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Monash University, 1996
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2007