THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 19:04:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Hospital Med. School, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Hospital Med. School, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Hospital Med. School, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2007