THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:41:34 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Debrecen, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gagandeep Sarkaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Medical University of Debrecen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gagandeep Sarkaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH SARKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARKARIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH SARKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARKARIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Debrecen, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2007