THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:51:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa, Ontario
K1K 0T2
Date Received: 13 Jun 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa, Ontario
K1K 0T2
Date Received: 13 Jun 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2007