THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:58:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Masaryk University in Brno, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4E 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 2034
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Tomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Aug 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH
Medical School: Masaryk University in Brno, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4E 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 2034
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Tomes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Aug 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LADISLAV TOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LADISLAV TOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Masaryk University in Brno, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2007