THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 22:26:21 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Dr. O'Reilly at: records@cardiocapstone.ca or Fax: 1-855-307-0183.
Date Received: 31 Jan 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O' Reilly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact Dr. O'Reilly at: records@cardiocapstone.ca or Fax: 1-855-307-0183.
Date Received: 31 Jan 2024

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O' Reilly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD O'REILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'REILLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD O'REILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'REILLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2007