THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:33:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Pediatrics
03 Mar 2008 to 28 Mar 2008
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatrics
DATE: 03 Mar 2008 to 28 Mar 2008
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2007