THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 05:53:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of London, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007