THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:14:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Thoracic Surgery
01 Mar 2008 to 31 Mar 2008
University of Toronto
EL - Thoracic Surgery
07 Jan 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Mar 2008 to 31 Mar 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 07 Jan 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Feb 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2008