THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:40:28 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 33855
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 17 Feb 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 33855
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 17 Feb 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jul 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 18 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CARLOS MAURICIO FORERO MANTILLA may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CARLOS MAURICIO FORERO MANTILLA may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jul 2024
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2008