THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:30:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Faisal Amir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammad Faisal Amir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2008