THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:18:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C A M H
General Adult Psychiatry
250 College Street Rm R132
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 36851
Fax: (416) 979-4666
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: 905) 430-4055
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Mar 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, ITALIAN
Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C A M H
General Adult Psychiatry
250 College Street Rm R132
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 36851
Fax: (416) 979-4666
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: 905) 430-4055
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Mar 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Daniel Josef Mueller may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Mueller holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirement of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Mueller no longer
holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Daniel Josef Mueller may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Mueller holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirement of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Mueller no longer
holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2008