THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 19:28:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1998
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
24 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 May 2008 to 23 Jul 2008
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 24 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 May 2008 to 23 Jul 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2008