THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:57:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Respirology,
501 Smyth Rd
Box 221,
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6

Tel: 613-798-5555
Date Received: 05 Apr 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Respirology,
501 Smyth Rd
Box 221,
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6

Tel: 613-798-5555
Date Received: 05 Apr 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008