THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:18:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-481-0982
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Igric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Igric (CPSO#: 88450 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-481-0982
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Igric Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Igric (CPSO#: 88450 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA IGRIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IGRIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA IGRIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IGRIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008