THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:39:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (418) 480-6100
Extension: 4864
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1000 Middlegate Rd
Suite 105
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oskar Singer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Singer (CPSO#: 88513 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M3200
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416 460 4864

Corporation Name: Oskar Singer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (418) 480-6100
Extension: 4864
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1000 Middlegate Rd
Suite 105
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oskar Singer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Singer (CPSO#: 88513 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M3200
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416 460 4864

Corporation Name: Oskar Singer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSKAR SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSKAR SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008