THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:11:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The George Hull Centre
for Children & Families
81 The East Mall, 3rd Floor
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Extension: 294
Fax: 416-622-7068
Address: The George Hull Centre
for Children and Families
81 The East Mall, Third Floor
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Fax: 416-622-7068
Address: NEOFACS
29 Kolb Avenue
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 1G2
Phone: (705) 335-2445
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
525 University Avenue, 7th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G2L3
Phone: 416-813-6200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: SickKids Centre for
Community Mental Health
114 Maitland Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Upasana Krishnadev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The George Hull Centre
for Children & Families
81 The East Mall, 3rd Floor
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Extension: 294
Fax: 416-622-7068
Address: The George Hull Centre
for Children and Families
81 The East Mall, Third Floor
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833
Fax: 416-622-7068
Address: NEOFACS
29 Kolb Avenue
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 1G2
Phone: (705) 335-2445
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
525 University Avenue, 7th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G2L3
Phone: 416-813-6200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: SickKids Centre for
Community Mental Health
114 Maitland Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Upasana Krishnadev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UPASANA KRISHNADEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNADEV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UPASANA KRISHNADEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNADEV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008