THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:39:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, T-Wing
Room T2-163
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6128
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander V Louie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Louie (CPSO#: 88563 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, T-Wing
Room T2-163
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6128
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander V Louie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Louie (CPSO#: 88563 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER VINCENT LOUIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER VINCENT LOUIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008