THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: Katz-Lavigne, Mikhael Jacob (Used Until: 13 Jan 2016)
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 491 Eglinton Ave W
Kindercare Pediatrics
Suite 301
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168487665
Fax: 4168487664
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Katz-Lavigne, Mikhael Jacob (Used Until: 13 Jan 2016)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 491 Eglinton Ave W
Kindercare Pediatrics
Suite 301
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168487665
Fax: 4168487664
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKAEL JACOB KATZ LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKAEL JACOB KATZ LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008