THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 700
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-842-3366
Fax: 905-842-1180
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 6th floorBond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5409
Fax: (416) 864-5949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Riolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 700
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-842-3366
Fax: 905-842-1180
Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 6th floorBond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5409
Fax: (416) 864-5949

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Riolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIOVANNA RIOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIOVANNA RIOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008