THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: Murrin-Schuler, Jane Elizabeth (Used Until: 08 Dec 2015)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-837-5454
Fax: 613-837-3781
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Extension: 4315
Fax: 613-907-8027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Schuler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: Murrin-Schuler, Jane Elizabeth (Used Until: 08 Dec 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-837-5454
Fax: 613-837-3781
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Extension: 4315
Fax: 613-907-8027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Schuler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH SCHULER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH SCHULER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008