THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33100 Cleveland Clinic Blvd
Avon OH 44011-1390
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-440-695-4034
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Omotoye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33100 Cleveland Clinic Blvd
Avon OH 44011-1390
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-440-695-4034
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Omotoye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL ADEWALE OMOTOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMOTOYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL ADEWALE OMOTOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMOTOYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008