THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:06:45 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9500 Euclid Ave
Cleveland Ohio 44195
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (216) 444-5690
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9500 Euclid Ave
Cleveland Ohio 44195
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (216) 444-5690
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENELOPE PHULMATEE RAMPERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMPERSAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENELOPE PHULMATEE RAMPERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMPERSAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008