THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Rue Saint-Denis
Pavillon C10
Montréal QC H2X 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5148908000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zoe Lysy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Rue Saint-Denis
Pavillon C10
Montréal QC H2X 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5148908000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zoe Lysy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZOE CLAIRE LYSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYSY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZOE CLAIRE LYSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYSY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008