THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6155 Coburg Road
Halifax
HAlifax Nova Scotia B3H 1Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (902) 446-0556
Fax: (902)479-4674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie A. Millard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6155 Coburg Road
Halifax
HAlifax Nova Scotia B3H 1Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (902) 446-0556
Fax: (902)479-4674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie A. Millard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE MILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE MILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008